+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Speaker laid before the House
- ROLL CALL NO. 326
- (Yeas 121 - Nays 22 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- Subsequently, FINALLY PASSED.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- FINALLY PASSED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 326
- (Yeas 121 - Nays 22 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-291) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-291)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-291).
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-291) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 22, 2015: Final Passage - Emer
- Yeas: 121
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 8