+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-326) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-326) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-326) Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-326).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Reconsidered
On April 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13161, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13155, sub-section 3
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13155, sub-section 5-B
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13155, sub-section 5-C
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13001, sub-section 4-A
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13157-A, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13155, sub-section 12
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13155, sub-section 5
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 13155, sub-section 1-A, paragraph A
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 1893, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 1893, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter 215 - 12 section 1893, sub-section 1, paragraph B
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor