+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On September 13, 2018 in the House:
- The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Later today assigned.
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-452), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-452) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-452).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor