+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-273) , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-273) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-273) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-273).
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife, in concurrence.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 219 - 12 section 11152, sub-section 5-A