+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-265) READ and ADOPTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 98 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-265) in concurrence
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subsequently, Representative O'CONNOR of Berwick WITHDREW her REQUEST for a Roll Call.
- Reports READ.
- Representative HYMANSON of York MOVED to accept the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative O'CONNOR of Berwick REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-265) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-265).
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 22 section 3736, sub-section 4
+ − Vote
May 21, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor