+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-156).
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-156).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-156) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 262 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report,
- Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 8, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1