+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 1395 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 30 In Favor and 4 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 101 having voted in the affirmative and 43 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 361V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-298) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-298), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-298)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative KRUGER for the Government Oversight Committee pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 997, subsection 2 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 253 - 5 section 12023, sub-section 3
+ − Votes (2)
June 23, 2015: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor