+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 243 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. FAILED
- Reports Read
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 84 - Nays 63 - Absent 3 - Excused 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 248
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2017: ACCEPT MIN OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 18
June 6, 2017: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3