+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto ADOPTED
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-146)
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) was ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) READ and ADOPTED
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) READ and ADOPTED
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-146).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-146) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
- Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 507 - 5 section 13056-G, sub-section 5
- Chapter 507 - 5 section 13056-G, sub-section 3, paragraph B
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor