+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (59)
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 459 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- Taken from the table by the President
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report Accepted AND the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-729) thereto in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 466 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 454 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- On motion of Representative MILLETT of Cape Elizabeth, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative MILLETT of Cape Elizabeth, the House RECEDED.
- On motion of Representative MILLETT of Cape Elizabeth, House Amendment "B" (H-729) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was READ and ADOPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 373
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-729) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-729) thereto
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 55 - Absent 18 - Excused 0)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- RELEASED.
- HELD at the Request of Senator SANBORN of Cumberland.
- Sent down for concurrence
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 407 Yeas 13 - Nays 21 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- Unfinished Business
- Senator RAFFERTY of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence.
- On motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- On motion of Representative LYMAN of Livermore Falls, House Amendment "A" (H-558) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was READ and FAILED ADOPTION.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 74 - Nays 63 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was READ.
- ROLL CALL NO. 265
- ROLL CALL NO. 266
- Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) was ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-545)
- ROLL CALL NO. 267
- (Yeas 75 - Nays 61 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 62 - Nays 74 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Representative BRENNAN of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Later today assigned.
On June 10, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On May 11, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on April 5, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 453 - 20-A section 4014
+ − Votes (8)
June 30, 2021: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2021: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 17, 2021: TABLE UNTIL LATER
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2021: ADOPT HBH-729 to CAH-545
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 18
June 16, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2021: Acc Maj OTP as Amended Rep
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 63
- Absent: 14
June 14, 2021: PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 61
- Absent: 15
June 14, 2021: ADOPT HAH-558 to CAH-545
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 74
- Absent: 15