+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-179), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-179) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-179)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 163 - 29-A section 1301, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 163 - 29-A section 1410, sub-section 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor