+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- LD 1365 In Senate, April 4, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 19 in the Affirmative and 14 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- RELEASED.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- HELD at the Request of Representative TREAT of Hallowell.
- 119 having voted in the affirmative and 25 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 615V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. Later today assigned.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-664) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-664), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-664)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2014: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 2, 2014: RECONSIDERATION - VETO
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor