+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-423).
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-423) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-423).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 23, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 11, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 14, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On May 11, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 5, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Scott CYRWAY
Type:
Primary Sponsor