+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ROLL CALL NO. 407V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 88 having voted in the affirmative and 59 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-352), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-352) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-352)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 26, 2013: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor