+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-243) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-243).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-243)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-243) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (71)
- Chapter 234 - 5 section 1742, sub-section 23, paragraph D
- Chapter 234 - 10 section 363, sub-section 11
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4702, sub-section 1
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4702, sub-section 5
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4702, sub-section 10, paragraph A
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4702, sub-section 10-A
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4702, sub-section 13
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4706, sub-section 5
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4706, sub-section 6
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4706, sub-section 7
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4721, sub-section 5
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph CC
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph DD
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph EE
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph F
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph FF
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph K
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph M
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph O
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph W
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph Y
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4724, sub-section 2
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4741, sub-section 10
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4741, sub-section 11
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4741, sub-section 17
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4752, sub-section 2
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4753, sub-section 2
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4754, sub-section 3
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4755
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4771, sub-section 4
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4832, sub-section 1
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4854, sub-section 3
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4854, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4863, sub-section 5
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4871, sub-section 2
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4912
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4913
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4921
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4922
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4926
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4927
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4928
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4951
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4952
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 4973, sub-section 2
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5002, sub-section 7
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5002, sub-section 10
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5002, sub-section 13
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5003
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5011
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5012
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5013
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5014
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5021
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5022
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5023
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5024
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5025
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5031
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5032
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5033
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5034
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5035
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5036
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5047, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5051
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5052
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5053
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5054
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5055
- Chapter 234 - 30-A section 5056
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor