+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 84 having voted in the affirmative and 64 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 98V
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED , in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence. Unfinished Business
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
- Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- READ the Second Time.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 93 - Nays 55 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 23
- On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife, in concurrence.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 3
April 14, 2015: ACC MAJ OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
MARTIN
Type:
Primary Sponsor