+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
- ROLL CALL NO. 347V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 85 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained.
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. Later today assigned.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 190 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) in concurrence
- READ ONCE
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 63 - Absent 5 - Excused 2)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 158
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-227).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 19, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 63
- Absent: 3
May 30, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 19
May 24, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor