+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 108 - Nays 34 - Absent 8 - Excused 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 24
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-9).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ a SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-9)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-9) READ and ADOPTEDASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: Enactment
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8