+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-148), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-148) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-148).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-148) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in concurrence.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 176 - 20-A section 4722, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 176 - 20-A section 4722-A, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor