+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ ONCEUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On May 19, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP
On May 11, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 159 - 32 section 81-A, paragraph 2
+ − Sponsor
Bradlee FARRIN
Type:
Primary Sponsor