+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- (S.P. 443) (L.D. 1281) "Resolve, Directing the Department of Professional and Financial Regular To Conduct a Sunrise Review Regarding the Proposal to License Recreational Therapists" In Senate, June 17, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 18 in favor and 17 against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 85 - Nays 53 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 163
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- (Yeas 86 - Nays 54 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- ROLL CALL NO. 133
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-117).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-117)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2013: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
May 31, 2013: Final Passage
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 53
- Absent: 13
May 28, 2013: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor