+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-384).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-384) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-384).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY
- Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 454 - 35-A section 3210-C, sub-section 8
- Chapter 454 - 35-A section 3210-F
- Chapter 454 - 35-A section 3603, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter 454 - 35-A section 3604, sub-section 8