+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-314) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-314), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS , in concurrence.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- Chapter 363 - 5 section 285, sub-section 1, paragraph F-11
- Chapter 363 - 5 section 12004-C, sub-section 9
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 5205, sub-section 11
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 15689-A, sub-section 25
- Chapter 363 - 22 section 2053, sub-section 4-B
- Chapter 363 - 25 section 2463-A, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8231
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8232
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8233
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8234
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8235
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8236
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8237
- Chapter 363 - 20-A section 8238
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor