+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-99).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-99) .
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-99) READ and ADOPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on TRANSPORTATION