+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-532), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Read Once
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-532) READ and ADOPTED
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-532).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec for the Committee on Taxation REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative GOODE from the Committee on TAXATION Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE , in concurrence.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
- Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.