+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-262) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-262), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-262).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 182 - 17 section 1836, sub-section 4-A
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor