+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Possession of the Committee Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES. (DEAD)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter null - 8 section 1036, sub-section 2-D
- Chapter null - 8 section 1018, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 8 section 1011, sub-section 2-C
- Chapter null - 8 section 1036, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 8 section 1035
- Chapter null - 8 section 1018, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 8 section 1020, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 8 section 1019, sub-section 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor