+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On July 4, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Unfinished Business
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor