+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-479).
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-479) READ and ADOPTED
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 697.
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec The Senate RECONSIDERED ENACTMENT in concurrence
- On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Judiciary , in concurrence.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Reports READ.
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-276)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 278
- Reports READ.
- Motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
- (Yeas 69 - Nays 77 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- On further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
- On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Later today assigned.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on JUDICIARY
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 16, 2015: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 77
- Absent: 5