+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-267).
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 189 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Reports Read
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 74 - Nays 68 - Absent 7 - Excused 2)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 164
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-267) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-267).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
May 25, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor