+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 1224 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 147 having voted in the affirmative and 1 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 672V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-629)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629).
- (Yeas 73 - Nays 77 - Absent 1 - Excused 0)
- Motion of Representative MALABY of Hancock to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. ROLL CALL NO. 567
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) READ
- Taken from the table by the President
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently, the Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-462) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-462) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-462) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 618 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report in concurrence
- Report READ
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4008, sub-section 5
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4008, sub-section 7
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4033, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4033, sub-section 2
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4033, sub-section 3
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4033, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4033, sub-section 4
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4033, sub-section 6
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4034, sub-section 1
- Chapter 501 - 22 section 4034, sub-section 4
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2016: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 147
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2016: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 7, 2016: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 77
- Absent: 1
April 6, 2016: ADOPT SAS-462 TO CAH-629
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor