+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-566).
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-566) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reports Read
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-566) Report ACCEPTED.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 288 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-566) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-566) in concurrence
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
- Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 5 section 17859
- Chapter 436 - 5 section 17859
+ − Vote
June 12, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14