+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate INSISTED To REFERENCE to Committee on Judiciary , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 85 - Nays 62 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 48
- Subsequently, the House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker EVES of North Berwick MOVED to INSIST.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending the motion of Speaker EVES of North Berwick to INSIST on REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Later today assigned.
- Unfinished Business
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator BURNS of Washington to REFER to the Committee on Judiciary , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Vote
April 30, 2015: Insist
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor