+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin, Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED , in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, in concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed.