+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-1014) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-564) thereto.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-1014) READ
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 761 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-564) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-1014) READ and ADOPTED
- On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-1014) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-564) thereto ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-1014) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-564) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
On April 14, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-1014).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-1014) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 10, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On February 24, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
- Carry Over Requested
On June 8, 2021 in the joint:
- Referred To - TAX
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on TAXATION.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- On motion by Same Senator Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Taxation In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
- RELEASED.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED
- Reports Read
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 208 Yeas 16 - Nays 18 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Subsequently, The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- HELD at the Request of Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 65 - Nays 71 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 101
- Motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
- Reports READ.
On May 19, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On April 22, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter 645 - 36 section 1818
- Chapter 645 - 36 section 4925
- Chapter 645 - 28-B section 407
- Chapter 645 - 28-B section 109
- Chapter 645 - 28-B section 108
- Chapter 645 - 28-B section 1101
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2022: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-B RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2022: ADOPT SAS-564 to cbh-1014
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 71
- Absent: 15