+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-238)
- On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) Report ACCEPTED
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-238).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion.
- Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot moved to Accept The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report
- Reports READ
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- Chapter null - 22 section 1560-D
- Chapter null - 17-A section 554, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 22 section 1580-F
- Chapter null - 17-A section 554, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 22 section 1541, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 495 - 22 section 1560-D
- Chapter 495 - 17-A section 554, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 495 - 22 section 1580-F
- Chapter 495 - 17-A section 554, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 495 - 22 section 1541, sub-section 1-A
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor