+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-451), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-451) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-451).
On June 8, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On June 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On May 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On April 14, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13001-A, sub-section 7
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13032, paragraph 1
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13031
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13022, sub-section 8
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13022, sub-section 4
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13022, sub-section 3
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13022, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13019-H, sub-section 4
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13019, sub-section 1
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13013, sub-section 2-B
- Chapter 228 - 20-A section 13012-B
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor