+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
- ROLL CALL NO. 765V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 96 having voted in the affirmative and 51 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-839), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-839) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 713
- (Yeas 106 - Nays 38 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-839)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-233) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-233), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-233)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 4
April 16, 2014: Enactment - Mandate
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor