+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-673).
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 337
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 61 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-673) was READ.
- On motion of Representative ARATA of New Gloucester House Amendment "A" (H-696) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-673) FAILED ADOPTION.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- (Yeas 62 - Nays 80 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-673) was ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- ROLL CALL NO. 338
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. FAILED.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subsequently, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-673)
- (Yeas 56 - Nays 79 - Absent 16 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 371
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford to RECEDE and CONCUR
- Speaker FECTEAU of Biddeford MOVED to INSIST.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 425 Yeas 14 - Nays 21 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Later today assigned.
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On June 9, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Reconsidered
On April 29, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter null - 5 section 4581-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 5 section 4581-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 5 section 4581-A, sub-section 3, paragraph B
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2021: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 79
- Absent: 16
June 17, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
June 16, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 61
- Absent: 9
June 16, 2021: ADOPT HAH-696 to CAH-673
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 80
- Absent: 9