+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (64)
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- LD 1170 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 IN FAVOR and 5 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Sent Forthwith.
- ROLL CALL NO. 463V
- 90 having voted in the affirmative and 44 in the negative, with 16 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- In concurrence. Sent to the Engrossing Department.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto and Senate Amendment "A" (S-325).
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) READ and ADOPTED
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) was READ.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 113 - Nays 34 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 383
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subsequently The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently Report B Ought Not To Pass FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 370 Yeas 4 - Nays 31 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) READ
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT Report B Ought Not to Pass,
- Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT Report B Ought Not to Pass.
- Reports READ
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter 308 - 22 section 1551, sub-section 1-D
- Chapter 308 - 22 section 1551, sub-section 2
- Chapter 308 - 22 section 1551, sub-section 3
- Chapter 308 - 22 section 1552-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 308 - 22 section 1553-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter 308 - 22 section 1555-B
+ − Votes (4)
August 2, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 16
August 2, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2017: ACC REPORT 'A' OTP AS AMEND
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 4
June 22, 2017: ACCEPT RPT 'B' ONTP
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 31
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor