+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- On motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook The Senate INSISTED To REFERENCE to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- RESOLUTION REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Edgecomb of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
- Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed