+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-761).
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-761) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-761), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 215
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 213, sub-section 3
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 212, sub-section 3
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 211
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 213, paragraph 1
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 214
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 212, sub-section 1
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 212, sub-section 2
- Chapter 677 - 7 section
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 213
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 214-A
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 215-A
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 218
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 218-A
- Chapter 677 - 7 section 220
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor