+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Reports Read
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 69 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 534
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Vote
March 27, 2018: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 69
- Absent: 4