+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (41)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-469).
- On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-469).
- On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-537) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-469) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-469) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-537) thereto was ADOPTED.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-469) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-537) in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 373 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-469) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-537) thereto.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-469) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 298 Yeas 13 - Nays 22 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
- Reports Read
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-469) in concurrence
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-469).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-469) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 22, 2017: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16
June 13, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 22
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor