+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted In Senate, June 11, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 in the Affirmative and 15 in the Negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- PREVAILED
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
- Roll Call Number 259
- (22 -Yeas, 13 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-227).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 89 - Nays 51 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 269
- On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) was READ and ADOPTED.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- (19 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- Roll Call Number 209
- READ ONCE.
- PREVAILED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) READ and ADOPTED .
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-227)..
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) Report.
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) Report.
- (Unfinished Business)
- Reports READ.
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) Report , in concurrence.
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) Report.
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2013: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
June 12, 2013: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 13
June 11, 2013: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 11
June 10, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1