+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-91).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-91) .
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-91) READ and ADOPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 343-H, sub-section 4
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 353, sub-section 9
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 353-A, sub-section 8
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 353-B, sub-section 5
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 420-B, sub-section 4
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 464, sub-section 3, paragraph C
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 570-K, sub-section 5
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 1310-N, sub-section 6-D
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 1319-O
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 1319-O, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 1319-O, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 1319-O, sub-section 3, paragraph B
- Chapter 124 - 38 section 1319-O, sub-section 3, paragraph C
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor