+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-266).
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 252 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Subsequently the motion to ACCEPT The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence
- Senator MASON of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- Motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
- (Yeas 58 - Nays 82 - Absent 10 - Excused 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 197
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- On further motion of same Representative the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-266) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-266).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2017: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 18
May 31, 2017: ACC MIN OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 82
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor