+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-33) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-33).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-33).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 23, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 11, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 47 - 32 section 1352-A, sub-section 1, paragraph A-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor