+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT , in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE , in concurrence.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor