+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report
- Report READ
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED , in concurrence.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 142
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- On OBJECTION of Representative SHAW of Standish REMOVED.
- The Committee Report was READ.
- Representative SHAW of Standish MOVED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers.
- On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending the motion of Representative SHAW of Standish to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers.
- (Yeas 107 - Nays 36 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 146
- (Yeas 83 - Nays 63 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: TABLE UNTIL LATER
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 8
June 3, 2015: INDEF POSTPONE BILL & PAPERS
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 63
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor